Zamora Jordan v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Laura Zamora Jordan |
Defendant: |
Nationstar Mortgage LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00175 |
Filed: |
June 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington |
Office: |
Spokane Office |
County: |
Chelan |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas O. Rice |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 2, 2019 |
Filing
413
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing
262
ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 217 is GRANTED in part. Partial summary judgment is GRANTED as to liability for common law trespass and Consumer Protection Act violations for all Class members who had their properties rekeyed prior to foreclosure. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Filing
157
ORDER DENYING FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCYS MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. The Federal Housing Finance Agencys Certification for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) ECF No. 152 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
March 9, 2017 |
Filing
147
ORDER denying 118 Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response to Nationstar's Motion to Decertify Class in Part (ECF No. 119) shall be filed no later than 3/24/2017. Nationstar's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 3/31/2017. The motion will be heard on 4/10/2017 without oral argument. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
|
October 14, 2016 |
Filing
112
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
90
ORDER DENYING RECONSIDERATION. Nationstars Motion for Reconsideration of the July 21, 2016 Summary Judgment Order ECF No. 82 is DENIED. The upcoming telephonic scheduling conference remains set. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing
80
ORDER LIFTING THE STAY AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court-imposed stay ECF No. 72 is hereby LIFTED. Nationstars Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 45 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. As this Court previou sly ruled, Defendants motion, as it pertains to Plaintiffs individual FDCPA claim, is GRANTED. See ECF No. 71 . As indicated herein, the remainder of Defendants motion is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 61 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing
72
ORDER CERTIFYING QUESTIONS TO WASHINGTON SUPREME COURT. Further proceedings in this Court are STAYED pending the Washington Supreme Courts decision whether it will accept review, and if so, the proceedings will remain stayed pending receipt of the answers to the certified questions. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
September 9, 2014 |
Filing
18
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiffs Motion for Remand ECF No. 10 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs request for costs and expenses, including attorneys fees pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c) is GRANTED. By 9/24/2014 Plaintiff shall file an affidavit and itemization of costsand attorney's fees incurred solely with respect to Defendant's removal.Defendant shall have until 10/8/2014 to provide its objections.The case is REMANDED to Chelan County Superior Court for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?