Kaech v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victor James Kaech
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Doe Defendants 1 through 20 and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00330
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Chelan
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS EMOTIONAL DISTRESS CLAIMS, granting 62 Motion to Dismiss Emotional Distress Claims. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, granting 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, granting 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Spokane, Washington, Post Office - Courtroom 3, before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (PL, Case Administrator)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaech v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor James Kaech
Represented By: Melissa A. Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman Jr
Represented By: Sakae S Sakai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman Jr
Represented By: Sakae S Sakai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin McDougal Stines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman Jr
Represented By: Sakae S Sakai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?