Leisure Concepts Inc v. California Home Spas Inc et al
Plaintiff: Leisure Concepts Inc
Defendant: California Home Spas Inc, Discounter's Pool & Spa Warehouse and Litehouse Products LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00388
Filed: December 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Granting 131 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SK, Case Administrator)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Granting 68 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (RG, Ops Supervisor)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT CLAIM - granting 69 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss its Copyright Infringement Claim. Plaintiffs claim of copyright infringement related to its instruction manual, Count 2, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER MEMORIALIZING THE COURT'S RULINGS REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER. Denying 41 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SK, Case Administrator)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS, granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SK, Case Administrator)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leisure Concepts Inc v. California Home Spas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leisure Concepts Inc
Represented By: Gregory C Hesler
Represented By: Shamus T O'Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Home Spas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discounter's Pool & Spa Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litehouse Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?