City of Spokane v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Spokane
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Solutia Inc, Pharmacia Corporation and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 2:2015cv00201
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; granting 253 Motion for Protective Order; granting 254 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY DOCUMENTS. Granting 209 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order for Third Party Documents; granting 210 Stipulated Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING 156 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS Re: 83 Plaintiff's Motion to Monsanto's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 62 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Spokane v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Spokane
Represented By: Carla Burke(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Represented By: Celeste A Evangelisti
Represented By: John Paul Fiske(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Represented By: John Gomez(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Represented By: Nancy L Isserlis
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise Schoedel
Represented By: Scott Summy(Designation Waived or Self (Pro Se))
Represented By: Hunt M Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?