Duggan v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Philip A Duggan
Defendant: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service and Taxpayer Advocate Service
Case Number: 2:2016cv00034
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Stevens
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6532
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Philip A Duggan (cc: Philip A. Duggan, along with ECF No. 93 via first class mail). (PL, Case Administrator)
August 11, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 53 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part ECF No. 78 , and Granting 82 Motion to Strike ECF No. 80 Affidavit in Support of Motion (cc: Philip A. Duggan via first class mail). Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)
August 10, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order Granting the United States of America's Suggestion of Subject Matter Jurisdiction With Respect to Counts 1 and 2 of the Complaint (cc: Philip A. Duggan via first class mail). Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)
March 22, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' SUGGESTION OF LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS 1 AND 2 OF THE COMPLAINT - granting 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CC, Case Administrator)
September 28, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO RECONSIDER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
August 4, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 8-13 OF THE COMPLAINT - granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CC, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duggan v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taxpayer Advocate Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?