Renfroe v. Citibank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Jan M Renfroe
Defendant: Citibank NA, Bank of America NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 2:2017cv00194
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Okanogan
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 27, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AND BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF Nos. 7 and 8 ). Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator)
August 22, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Defendants Bank of America N.A. and The Bank of New York Mellon's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (PL, Case Administrator) Modified on 8/22/2017 (PL, Case Administrator). THIS ORDER IS STRICKEN. SEE ECF NO. 33 .
August 3, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND, denying 11 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (LR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renfroe v. Citibank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Represented By: Joseph Ward McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Daniel J Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Ward McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Represented By: Robert William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Daniel J Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan M Renfroe
Represented By: Robert K Hunter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?