Young v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Diane Young
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00031
Filed: January 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING 113 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 86 90 , GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ALLEGATIONS 54 , AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRE-CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY finding as moot 66 Motion to Compel - Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ENTERING STAY PENDING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS staying 54 Motion to Dismiss; staying 66 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED 48 MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO EXPEDITE 49 . Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Young
Represented By: JJ Jesse Junior Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Galina Kletser Jakobson
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?