Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc v. Century-Omaha Land LLC et al
Plaintiff: Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc
Defendant: Century-Omaha Land LLC and Edwin W Leslie
Case Number: 2:2018cv00131
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Thomas O. Rice
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT LESLIES MOTION TO RECONSIDER 40 . Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc and against Edwin W Leslie (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment amended to correct spelling of defendant's name. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc against Century-Omaha Land LLC (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc v. Century-Omaha Land LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc
Represented By: Jordan Clark
Represented By: Hugh McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century-Omaha Land LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin W Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?