Federal Cartridge Company v. Hedrick et al

Plaintiff: Federal Cartridge Company
Defendant: John 1-10 Does and Harold E Hedrick
Case Number: 2:2018cv00251
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Asotin
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to #5 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment (Prejudgment), #6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion Hearing reset for 10/1/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Hold Motions in Abeyance. Plaintiff's #5 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment (Prejudgment) and #6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause are held in abeyance until 10/1/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE.(BF, Paralegal)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Sealed Document by Federal Cartridge Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kapaun, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT by Jessie Semmes in Support re #5 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment (Prejudgment) filed by Federal Cartridge Company. (Kapaun, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff shall file Exhibits A through E to Jessie Semmes affidavit under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue and Hold in Abeyance re #6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , #5 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment (Prejudgment) by Federal Cartridge Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kapaun, Michael)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David P Gardner on behalf of Harold E Hedrick (Attorney David P Gardner added to party Harold E Hedrick(pty:dft))(Gardner, David)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Cartridge Company re Harold E Hedrick. (Kapaun, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Harold E Hedrick on 8/13/18 by Federal Cartridge Company. (Kapaun, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to Seal by Federal Cartridge Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kapaun, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Federal Cartridge Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kapaun, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment (Prejudgment) by Federal Cartridge Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Kapaun, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Harold E Hedrick. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Federal Cartridge Company. (Kapaun, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Cartridge Company. (Kapaun, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John 1-10 Does, Harold E Hedrick Jury Demand. Filed by Federal Cartridge Company. Fee: $400.00 Receipt Number 0980-2957634. Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kapaun, Michael) Modified on 8/9/2018 to add receipt number.(AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Cartridge Company v. Hedrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold E Hedrick
Represented By: David P Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Cartridge Company
Represented By: Michael John Kapaun
Represented By: Casey M Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?