Bonner vs. Rexon Industrial Corp, et al.

Plaintiff: Mr. Steven Bonner and Steven Bonner
Defendant: Rexon Industrial Corp, Power Tools Specialists Inc and Sears Roebuck & Co
Case Number: 2:2018cv00288
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
November 9, 2018 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Power Tools Specialists Inc.(Collins, Thomas)
November 1, 2018 11 Featured Case TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting, for good cause shown, ECF No. #10 , Defendant Power Tool Specialists, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead to the Complaint. Having reviewed the motion and there being no objection, the Court hereby extends Defendant's deadline to answer to November 9, 2018. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
October 31, 2018 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Power Tools Specialists Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Collins, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Collins on behalf of Power Tools Specialists Inc (Attorney Thomas J Collins added to party Power Tools Specialists Inc(pty:dft))(Collins, Thomas)
October 25, 2018 8 NOTICE by Sears Roebuck & Co Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vollans, Ryan)
October 23, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Sears, Roebuck & Co. filed by Steven Bonner. (Swapp, Ryan)
September 18, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Rexon Industrial Corp, Sears Roebuck & Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
September 18, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Power Tools Specialists Inc. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
September 17, 2018 3 SUPPLEMENT by Steven Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Ermola, Roger)
September 17, 2018 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint by Steven Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Ermola, Roger)
September 17, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Bonner ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2986488) Jury Demand. Filed by Steven Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ermola, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner vs. Rexon Industrial Corp, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Steven Bonner
Represented By: Brandon Casey
Represented By: Roger J Ermola, II
Represented By: Ryan Swapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bonner
Represented By: Brandon Casey
Represented By: Roger J Ermola, II
Represented By: Ryan Swapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexon Industrial Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Tools Specialists Inc
Represented By: Thomas J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?