United States of America v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Allison Walker Baker, CHS Inc, McCain Foods USA Inc and Jordan James Baker
Case Number: 2:2018cv00298
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Chadwick on behalf of CHS Inc (Attorney Kenneth W Chadwick added to party CHS Inc(pty:dft))(Chadwick, Kenneth)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. #5 JOINT MOTION FOR REGISTRY PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court's Registry by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donovan, Brian)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Disclaimer of Interest between US and McCain Foods, USA, Inc. by United States of America. (Donovan, Brian)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re Jordan James Baker. (Donovan, Brian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re CHS Inc. (Donovan, Brian)
September 24, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allison Walker Baker, Jordan James Baker Fee Waived Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Walker Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc
Represented By: Kenneth W Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCain Foods USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan James Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?