John Gabor et al v. Mariam Carter Deshler et.al.
Plaintiff: Kay Gabor and John Gabor
Defendant: Estate of Miriam Carter Deshler, Miriam Carter Deshler, Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey, Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services and Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00312
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 118 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 117 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with jury demand. by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey.(Wall, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D Wall on behalf of Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey (Attorney Richard D Wall added to party Rebecca Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Richard D Wall added to party Kristin Humphrey(pty:dft))(Wall, Richard)
October 29, 2018 Filing 115 Notice of Intent to Move for Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs (Nguyen, Theresa)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kate E. Lazarus added for Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 26, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kate E. Lazarus. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3019307. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Kate E. Lazarus, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Theresa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Reese Nguyen on behalf of John Gabor, Kay Gabor (Attorney Theresa Reese Nguyen added to party John Gabor(pty:pla), Attorney Theresa Reese Nguyen added to party Kay Gabor(pty:pla))(Nguyen, Theresa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 111 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:17-cv-01524. Docket sheet received.
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #101 Motion to Transfer Case.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iymS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 109 ***CLERK'S NOTICE RE: CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE***Pursuant to this notice, the 10/3/2018 Further Case Management Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to October 24, 2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/27/18. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 106 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lazarus in Support of Plaintiffs Separate Case Management Statement)(Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 9/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kay Gabor, John Gabor. Rebecca Harris served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018; Kristin Humphrey served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018; Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018; Estate of Miriam Carter Deshler served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 9/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #101 First MOTION to Transfer Case TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #103 Motion to Shorten Time.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION to Shorten Time , DECLARATION OF KATE LAZARUS, PROPOSED ORDER filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 102 Summons Issued as to Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey, Lord & Carter, Estate of Miriam Carter Deshler. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 101 First MOTION to Transfer Case TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/13/2018. Replies due by 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 100 Proposed Summons. (Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 99 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey, Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services, Estate of Miriam Carter Deshler. Filed byJohn Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 98 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 8/8/2018 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 10/3/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, Extending Deadline to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/19/18. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further discovery proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/7/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice #83 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting Leave to Amend. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 94 ***CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT*** The Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. #83 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 5/31/2018 at 1:30 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 5/31/2018 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 93 ***CLERK'S NOTICE*** Pursuant to this Notice, the 4/18/2018 Further Case Management Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to August 8, 2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a).. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #83 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court. Hearing advanced to 5/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh pursuant to ECF No. #92 . (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #86 Motion to Shorten Time.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 91 Declaration of Bryan Barnes in Support of #83 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Related document(s) #83 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 90 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of John Gabor in Support of #83 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Related document(s) #83 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Gabor, Kay Gabor re #85 Proposed Order, #83 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court, #84 Declaration in Support (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 88 Proposed Order re #86 MOTION to Shorten Time by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 87 Declaration of John Gabor in Support of #86 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by John Gabor. (Related document(s) #86 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 85 Proposed Order re #83 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 84 Declaration of John Gabor in Support of #83 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Related document(s) #83 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/19/2018. Replies due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 82 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to REBECCA HARRIS and KRISTIN HUMPHREY (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Related documents(s) #80 )(pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) ***ORDER VACATED PER ECF NO. #95 *** Modified on 6/7/2018 (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 81 Declaration of John Gabor in Support of #80 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (Related document(s) #80 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON #71 PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE DISCOVERY DISPUTE STATEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 78 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-24-18, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2018. (las, ) (Filed on 1/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/24/2018. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/24/18 from 3:08 - 3:13 PM (5 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 4/18/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): John Gabor and Kay Gabor. For Defendant(s): Failed to appear. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Gabor, Kay Gabor re #74 Interrogatories to Rebecca Harris (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 74 Interrogatories to Rebecca Harris by John Gabor, Kay Gabor (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Gabor, Kay Gabor re #71 Separate Discovery Dispute Statement (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 71 SEPARATE DISCOVERY DISPUTE STATEMENT filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey of Pro Se Address Etc. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 11/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Granting #67 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 68 RESPONSE to #65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #67 Ex Parte Application filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 67 Ex Parte Application filed by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 11/6/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 66 ***CLERK'S NOTICE*** Defendants Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ECF no. #65 filed on November 2, 2017 is hereby rescheduled to January 25, 2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Parties shall familiarize themselves the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Specifically, any civil motion under L.R. 7-2 may be noticed for hearing only after contacting Judge Koh's Courtroom Deputy and obtaining an available date. Please see http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhkorders.(Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. Responses due by 11/16/2017. Replies due by 11/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, David) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE by John Gabor, Kay Gabor re: #1 Complaint, (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of ONLY Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by John Gabor, Kay Gabor (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Wraight, Mark) (Filed on 10/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Gabor, Kay Gabor re #60 John Gabor my release and dismissing Wells Fargo Bank in Judge Lloyd Court from complaint on Oct. 11, 2017 was an Error, #59 Refuse to allow husband John Gabor to release or dismiss claims against Wells Fargo Bank on Oct. 11, 2017 in Judge Lloyd Court (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 60 John Gabor my release and dismissing Wells Fargo Bank in Judge Lloyd Court from complaint on Oct. 11, 2017 was an Error by John Gabor (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 59 Refuse to allow husband John Gabor to release or dismiss claims against Wells Fargo Bank on Oct. 11, 2017 in Judge Lloyd Court by Kay Gabor (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: Settlement Conference held on 10/11/2017. Partial Settlement reached. Plaintiffs' and Wells Fargo Bank reached a settlement agreement ONLY. There will be NO written settlement agreement, parties agree the RECORD (FTR)is sufficient by all parties to document the partial settlement. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank will submit the required documentation to Plaintiffs' for finalizing the agreement with Plaintiffs and distribution of funds. Plaintiff Attorney: Zhuanjia Gu. Defendant Attorney: Mark Wraight. FTR Time: 2:17-2:20. Courtroom Deputy: Adriana Kratzmann. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #57 . Further Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial (4 day estimate) set for 2/11/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 20, 2017. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/20/17 from 2:46 - 3:13 PM (27 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): John and Kay Gabor, self-representing. For Defendant(s): Alisa A. Givental, appearing telephonically, David B. Fisher and Brien Kirk, personally present. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Gabor, Kay Gabor re #54 Notice of Production of Documents and Statement to Follow (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 54 Production of Documents & Statement to Follow by John Gabor, Kay Gabor (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #9 Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend; Denying #12 Harris and Humphrey's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting #46 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iymS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2017: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service CORRECTED) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #50 WELLS FARGO & COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT SEPTEMBER 20, 2017 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 9/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 9/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Defendants filed by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 9/13/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order to Locate Counsel (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions to Dismiss (ECF No. #9 and ECF No. #12 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 9/14/2017 at 1:30 PM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 9/14/2017 hearings are VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Ian Wraight on Behalf of Defendant (Wraight, Mark) (Filed on 8/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
July 18, 2017 Filing 43 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-21-17, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #42 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2017. (Related documents(s) #42 ) (las, ) (Filed on 7/18/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/21/2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by John Gabor, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bruce Fisher (Brien Kirk) (Fisher, David) (Filed on 6/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 21, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings pursuant to ECF No. #40 . #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #9 MOTION to Dismiss reset to 9/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 21, 2017. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/21/17 from 2:07-2:40 PM (33 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 9/20/17 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s):John Gabor and Kay Gabor, Pro Se. For Defendant(s): Alisa Giventhal (appearing telephonically), David Fisher, and Brien Kirk. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order granting #37 - Defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh 6/15/17.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 6/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 36 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey, Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 6/14/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 33 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 32 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT** Set/Reset Deadlines as to ECF no. #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and ECF no. #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motions reset to 8/31/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 17, 2017 Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order John Gabor to the address of 590 Smokey Court, Campbell, CA 95008 and to Kay Gabor to the address of 590 Smokey Court, Campbell, CA 95008 via USPS first class mail (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibiity for Bideo Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Status Conference held on 5/16/2017 re non-appearance of Defendants Miriam Carter Deshler and Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services. No appearance or consents on file as to Defendants Miriam Carter Deshler and Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services. The court orders case reassigned to a United States District Judge. 6/6/2017 and 6/13/2017 Motions to Dismiss (In Re: ECF Nos. #9 and #12 ) presently set before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen are hereby VACATED. FTR Time: 9:33 to 9:53 (20 mins.) Plaintiff(s) present: John Kay, in pro se and Kay Gabor, in pro se. Defendant Attorney(s) present: David Fisher and Brien Kirk. This is a text-only Minute Entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE RE: NON-APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS MIRIAM CARTER DESHLER AND LORD & CARTER TRUST & TRUSTEE SERVICES: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 10, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 5/10/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 10, 2017 Filing 26 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byWells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 5/10/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 9, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byRebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kristen Humphrey, #2 Declaration Paul Calabro)(Fisher, David) (Filed on 5/9/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 24 Proposed Order re #23 Opposition/Response to Motion by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Attorney Paul Calabro is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/3/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2017: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 21 Proposed Order by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 5/3/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: NON-APPEARANCE OF PARTIES: Status Conference re non-appearance of Defendants Miriam Carter Deshler and Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services is hereby set for 5/16/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 25, 2017 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kay Gabor.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017) (cvS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 25, 2017 Filing 16 Proposed Order #12 by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 4/25/2017) Modified on 4/25/2017 (cvS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING PLAINTIFF KAY GABOR TO FILE A CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THIS NOTICE: Plaintiff Kay Gabor shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/26/2017. Please note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. Form is attached and also available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey.. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 4/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice filed byRebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 4/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 5/3/2017. Replies due by 5/10/2017. (Fisher, David) (Filed on 4/19/2017) Modified on 4/25/2017 (cvS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 4/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A... (Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 4/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 5/3/2017. Replies due by 5/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Givental, Alisa) (Filed on 4/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 18, 2017 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Gabor.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by John Gabor, Kay Gabor as to Miriam Carter Deshler. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gabor, Kay Gabor. Rebecca Harris served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017; Kristin Humphrey served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017; Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 12, 2017 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JUNE 19, 2017 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 6/19/2017 Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to 6/20/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
April 6, 2017 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/20/2017. Please note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. Form is attached and also available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rebecca Harris, Kristin Humphrey, Miriam Carter Deshler, Lord and Carter Trust & Trustee Services, Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.Receipt # 54611016770). Filed byJohn Gabor, Kay Gabor. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) Modified on 3/21/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Gabor et al v. Mariam Carter Deshler et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Miriam Carter Deshler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Carter Deshler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Harris
Represented By: David Bruce Fisher
Represented By: Richard D Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Humphrey
Represented By: David Bruce Fisher
Represented By: Richard D Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord & Carter Trust & Trustee Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank,N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Gabor
Represented By: Zhuanjia Gu
Represented By: Kate Ellis Lazarus
Represented By: Michael S Kwun
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Represented By: Theresa Reese Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gabor
Represented By: Zhuanjia Gu
Represented By: Kate Ellis Lazarus
Represented By: Michael S Kwun
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Represented By: Theresa Reese Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?