Lagrou v. Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Petitioner: Christina Lagrou
Respondent: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Interested Party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 2:2018cv00313
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Cooper, Carson)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Carson)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION relating to Monterey Financial Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Cooper, Carson)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant Monterey Financial Services, LLCs Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #11 , is GRANTED. Richard M. Scherer, Jr. is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants local counsel of record, Carson R. Cooper, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW. THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURTS RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Stanley A. Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Richard M. Scherer, Jr.. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3013986. by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Carson)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carson R Cooper on behalf of Monterey Financial Services, LLC (Attorney Carson R Cooper added to party Monterey Financial Services, LLC(pty:res))(Cooper, Carson)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00283. Docket sheet received.
October 9, 2018 Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Washington. Case File and public Docket Report sent electronically. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on the Amended Motion to (1) Withdraw Reference of Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint from the Bankruptcy Court and (2) Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Washington (ECF No. #1 ). In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw the Reference. In addition, upon due consideration, and finding it appropriate to do so under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Court ORDERS that this matter be TRANSFERRED to the EASTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/09/2018. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/09/2018. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion by Monterey Financial Services, LLC for the Admission of Richard M. Scherer, Jr., Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 05/18/2018. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard M. Scherer, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Timothy G. Moore Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6085574. by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Local Rule 83.1(D) Application)(Moore, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion by Christina Lagrou for the Admission of Stephen F. Taylor, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 05/09/2018. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stepen F. Taylor and Certification of Local Counsel Ronald A. Page, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6071719. by Christina Lagrou. (Page, Ronald) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Supplemental Designation of Documents filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC re: #1 MOTION for Withdrawal of Reference. (jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Withdrawal of Reference together with USBC Transmittal, Docket Sheet, and Designation Record by Christina Lagrou. (Attachments: #1 part 1, #2 part 2, #3 part 3, #4 part 4)(tjoh, ) Modified on 5/4/2018 (jtho, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagrou v. Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: James Kerr Donaldson
Represented By: Timothy George Moore
Represented By: Richard M. Scherer, Jr.
Represented By: Carson R Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christina Lagrou
Represented By: Stephen F. Taylor
Represented By: Ronald Allen Page, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?