Delgado v. Flores et al
Plaintiff: David A Delgado
Defendant: Maritza Flores, Spokane County Superior Court State of Washington, Michael Addams, Washington State DCS, Washington State Attorney General, Addams & Leavitt PLLC, Robert Cossey & Associates and Mark Hodgeson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00328
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. The claims asserted in Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 6) are DISMISSED without prejudice and WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff may file a Second Complaint within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file within 60 days as directed, the Court will dismiss this entire case for failure to state a claim under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Amended Complaint/Voluntary Dismissal Deadline set for 2/11/2019. Plaintiffs Mandamus Petition ECF No. #8 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #8 Mandamus Petition filed by David A Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Addendum - Statement of Facts)(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE - STATEMENT OF FACTS by David A Delgado. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 MANDAMUS PETITION AND MEMORANDUM by David A Delgado.Hearing set for 12/10/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Complaint)(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Sealed Attachments to Complaint filed by David A Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Attachment No. 4, #2 Sealed Attachment No. 4 Continued, #3 Sealed Attachment No. 4 Continued) (CV, Case Administrator)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Michael Addams, Addams & Leavitt PLLC, Maritza Flores, Mark Hodgeson, Robert Cossey & Associates, Spokane County Superior Court State of Washington, Washington State Attorney General, Washington State DCS (Receipt # IFP) Filed by David A Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2)(CV, Case Administrator)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff seeks to file in forma pauperis a pro se Complaint. Because it appears Plaintiff lacks sufficient funds to prosecute this action, the District Court Executive shall file the Complaint without payment of the filing fee. In addition, the District Court Executive shall set a case management review for 30 days, and immediately notify the assigned judicial officer, who will review the Complaint for legal sufficiency and determine whether to direct service. IT IS SO ORDERED. - Text entry;no PDF document. Case Management Deadline set for 11/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Sealed Attachments to Complaint filed by David A Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Attachment No. 4, #2 Proposed Sealed Attachment No. 4 Continued, #3 Proposed Sealed Attachment No. 4 Continued)(CV, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/19/2018 to correct received date (CV, Case Administrator).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT - Receipt # none (IFP) Filed by David A Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CV, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/19/2018 to correct received date (CV, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritza Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane County Superior Court State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Addams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State DCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addams & Leavitt PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cossey & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hodgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?