McKinstry et al v. Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States, Melissa C Richardson and Matthew A McKinstry
Defendant: State of Oregon, Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC, Doe 1-100 and Malcolm Cisneros
Case Number: 2:2018cv00363
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 pro se Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain ECF Login and Password. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued in Paper as to All Defendants. (LR, Case Administrator)
December 3, 2018 Payment Received: Receipt #SPO033622 in the amount of $50.00 from Melissa Richardson re Partial Filing Fee Ordered at ECF No. #6 . (LR, Case Administrator)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $50.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Case Management Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by Matthew A McKinstry. Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals some incomplete responses. Within (15) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, show cause why prepayment would be inappropriate, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 12/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # IFP) Filed by Matthew A McKinstry, Melissa C Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(TR, Case Administrator) Modified on 11/26/2018: Exhibit 4 Sealed due to personal identifiers. (TR, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinstry et al v. Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa C Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A McKinstry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?