Lopez v. Whitmire et al

Plaintiff: Elvis Renteria Camilo Lopez
Defendant: Doug Hollenback, Bruce Spanner, Shawna Nessin, Stanley A Bastian, Scott Etherton, Benton County Sheriff's Office, Megan A Whitmire and Remona Gonzalez
Case Number: 2:2018cv00378
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FILING FEE REQUIREMENTS. Plaintiff must complete and file the financial affidavit as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) or pay the full $400.00 fee by 3/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
January 25, 2019 10 PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint by Elvis Renteria Camilo Lopez. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (SG, Case Administrator)
January 18, 2019 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elvis Renteria Camilo Lopez (SG, Case Administrator)
December 12, 2018 8 SECOND NOTICE RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH E-FILING PROGRAM. The Eastern District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 16-35-1, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at facilities participating in the Prison E-Filing Program. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the law librarian/designee for electronic filing. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Elvis Lopez, Prisoner ID: 813011)
December 11, 2018 6 NOTICE RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH E-FILING PROGRAM. The Eastern District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 16-35-1, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at facilities participating in the Prison E-Filing Program. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the law librarian/designee for electronic filing. (TR, Case Administrator) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Elvis Lopez, Prisoner ID: 813011)
December 7, 2018 5 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment and Authorization form) (TR, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Elvis Lopez, Prisoner ID: 813011)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # IFP) Jury Demand. Filed by Elvis Renteria Camilo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator) **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Elvis Lopez, Prisoner ID: 813011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Whitmire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Hollenback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Spanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawna Nessin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley A Bastian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Etherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan A Whitmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remona Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Renteria Camilo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?