Blocktree Properties LLC et al v. Public Utility District No. 2 of Grant County Washington et al
Plaintiff: WeHash Technology LLP, 509 Mine LLC, Corsair Investments WA LLC, Miners United LLC, MIM Investors LLC, TELCO 214 Wholesale Software Inc, Blocktree Properties LLC, Cytline LLC and Mark Vargas
Defendant: Bob Bernd, Dale Walker, Does 1-10, Tom Flint, Larry Schaapman, Public Utility District No 2 of Grant County Washington and Terry Brewer
Case Number: 2:2018cv00390
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION by Eric Christensen in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 52 ISO Declaration)(Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION by Eric Yingling in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION by Paul Lum in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION by Stephen Wood in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION by Justin Yochum in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION by Bryan Snyder in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION by William Kemp in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4 ISO of Declaration)(Christensen, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Christensen, Eric)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) GRANTING the Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #23 . The parties move the Court for leave to file excess pages in their upcoming motion for preliminary injunction. Good cause exists to grant the motion because of the number and complexity of the issues. Therefore, the parties are permitted to file briefs of the following lengths: 30 pages for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 30 pages for Defendants' Response; and 15 pages for Plaintiffs' Reply. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limits)(Christensen, Eric)
January 24, 2019 Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2019 at 02:00 PM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Johnson, Dale)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) GRANTING Defendants' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, ECF No. 19. Defendants shall answer Plaintiffs' complaint by January 23, 2019. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dale)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Cavarly McLellan on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Bob Bernd(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Terry Brewer(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Does 1-10(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Tom Flint(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Public Utility District No 2 of Grant County Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Larry Schaapman(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm Cavarly McLellan added to party Dale Walker(pty:dft))(McLellan, Malcolm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Noel Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Bob Bernd(pty:dft), Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Terry Brewer(pty:dft), Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Does 1-10(pty:dft), Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Tom Flint(pty:dft), Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Public Utility District No 2 of Grant County Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Larry Schaapman(pty:dft), Attorney Dale Noel Johnson added to party Dale Walker(pty:dft))(Johnson, Dale)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Valerie Caudill, Process Server re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by All Plaintiffs. (Tebbs, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Christopher Svelnys, Process Server re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by All Plaintiffs. (Tebbs, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Christopher Svelnys, Process Server re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by All Plaintiffs. (Tebbs, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Christopher Svelnys, Process Server re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by All Plaintiffs. (Tebbs, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Derek Martinez, Process Server re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by All Plaintiffs. (Tebbs, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Process Server re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, by All Plaintiffs. (Tebbs, Jonathan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of WeHash Technology by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of TELCO 214 Wholesale Software by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Miners United by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of MIM Investors LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Cytline LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Corsair Investments by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Blocktree Properties by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 509 Mine LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Christensen, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bob Bernd, Terry Brewer, Tom Flint, Public Utility District No 2 of Grant County Washington, Larry Schaapman, and Dale Walker. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Terry Brewer, #2 Summons Issued as to Bob Bernd, #3 Summons Issued as to Dale Walker, #4 Summons Issued as to Tom Flint, #5 Summons Issued as to Larry Schaapman)(LR, Case Administrator)
December 19, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3056427) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons PUD, #3 Summons Bob Bernd, #4 Summons Dale Walker, #5 Summons Larry Schaapman, #6 Summons Terry Brewer, #7 Summons Tom Flint)(Christensen, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocktree Properties LLC et al v. Public Utility District No. 2 of Grant County Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WeHash Technology LLP
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 509 Mine LLC
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corsair Investments WA LLC
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miners United LLC
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIM Investors LLC
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TELCO 214 Wholesale Software Inc
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blocktree Properties LLC
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cytline LLC
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vargas
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: Jonathan D Tebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Bernd
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Walker
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Flint
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Schaapman
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Utility District No 2 of Grant County Washington
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Brewer
Represented By: Malcolm Cavarly McLellan
Represented By: Dale Noel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?