Ochoa, et al v. Industrial Ventilation Inc, et al

Plaintiff: A&C Land Company LLC, AJ Ochoa Corporation, Terra Gold Farms Inc, AJ Ochoa and Jodi Ochoa
Defendant: Industrial Ventilation Inc and Teton West of Washington LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00393
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Errata filed by All Defendants : Re #11 Rule 26 / Rule 16 Attorney Report Parties' Signatures. (Risch, Jason)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26 / Rule 16 Attorney Report Parties' Combined Report by All Defendants. (Risch, Jason)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jason S Risch added for Industrial Ventilation Inc and Teton West of Washington LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jason S. Pisch. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3076619. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, West)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Campbell, West)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Campbell, West)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by West Harrison Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney West Harrison Campbell added to party Industrial Ventilation Inc(pty:dft), Attorney West Harrison Campbell added to party Teton West of Washington LLC(pty:dft))(Campbell, West)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (McWilliam, Jofrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Industrial Ventilation Inc, Teton West of Washington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
December 21, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (McWilliam, Jofrey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDUSTRIAL VENTILATION, INC., TETON WEST OF WASHINGTON, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3059334) Jury Demand. Filed by Jodi Ochoa, A&C Land Company, LLC, Terra Gold Farms, Inc., AJ Ochoa, AJ OCHOA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for IVI, #3 Summons for Teton West)(McWilliam, Jofrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa, et al v. Industrial Ventilation Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&C Land Company LLC
Represented By: Paul Renwick Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Ochoa Corporation
Represented By: Paul Renwick Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Gold Farms Inc
Represented By: Paul Renwick Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Ochoa
Represented By: Paul Renwick Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Ochoa
Represented By: Paul Renwick Taylor
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Ventilation Inc
Represented By: West Harrison Campbell
Represented By: Jason S Risch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teton West of Washington LLC
Represented By: West Harrison Campbell
Represented By: Jason S Risch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?