Easley v. McLaughlin

Plaintiff: Mr. Donald Easley and Donald Easley
Defendant: Mr. Michael McLaughlin and Michael McLaughlin
Case Number: 2:2018cv00398
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Attorney Michael John McLaughlin added to party Michael McLaughlin(pty:dft))(McLaughlin, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Easley re Donald Easley. (Hyndman, Jeremy)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael McLaughlin. (PL, Case Administrator)
December 31, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael McLaughlin ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3062785) Filed by Donald Easley. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hyndman, Jeremy) Modified on 1/2/2019 (PL, Case Administrator) to correct docket text.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Donald Easley
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Hyndman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Easley
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Hyndman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael John McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?