Waller v. City of Spokane et al

Plaintiff: Don Waller
Defendant: City of Spokane, IAFF Local 29, City of Spokane Fire Department and City of Spokane Washington
Case Number: 2:2019cv00018
Filed: January 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IAFF Local 29 re IAFF Local 29. (Lemonidis, SaNni)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Spokane Washington, IAFF Local 29. (Attachments: #1 Summons - City of Spokane)(VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 15, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Spokane, City of Spokane Fire Department and IAFF Local 29. Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0980-3071615. Filed by Don Waller.(Haynes, Robin) Modified on 1/15/2019 to add receipt number and defendant name in docket text (CV, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. City of Spokane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Waller
Represented By: Robin Lynn Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAFF Local 29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?