Baker et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Elaine Baker, Kevin Baker and William Baker
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00034
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Kuznetz, Lawrence)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(Belnavis, Clarence)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Belnavis, Clarence)
January 23, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3079347 Filed by Wal-Mart, Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Belnavis, Clarence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Baker
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Harmon
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Kuznetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Baker
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Harmon
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Kuznetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Baker
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Harmon
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Kuznetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Margaret Ann Burnham
Represented By: Clarence M Belnavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?