United States of America v. Four firearms from various manufacturers, makes, models and assorted calibers et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Four firearms from various manufacturers, makes, models and assorted calibers, $40,950.00 U.S. currency and 431 rounds of assorted ammunition
Case Number: 2:2019cv00039
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN by the U.S. Marshalls re Warrant of Arrest in Rem of $40,950.00 U.S. currency. (SG, Case Administrator) (SG, Case Administrator)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Warrant of Arrest In Rem. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Donovan, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants Fee Waived Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Four firearms from various manufacturers, makes, models and assorted calibers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four firearms from various manufacturers, makes, models and assorted calibers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $40,950.00 U.S. currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 431 rounds of assorted ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?