Greenwalt v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Renee Greenwalt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00044
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sinclair Howard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Michael Sinclair Howard added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Howard, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Greenwalt re Commissioner of Social Security. (Hatfield, Chad)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 3/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PL, Case Administrator)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons Joe Harrington, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(PL, Case Administrator)
February 1, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Renee Greenwalt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwalt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Michael Sinclair Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Greenwalt
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?