Roy v. United States Bureau of Prisons

Petitioner: Emmanuel Roy
Respondent: United States Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 2:2019cv00059
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #5 PETITIONER'S 28 U.S.C. 2241 AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ECF No. #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Case closed. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SG, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT REPLY re #7 Response to Motion by Emmanuel Roy. (SG, Case Administrator)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION re Home Confinement filed by Emmanuel Roy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Smoot, Russell)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E Smoot on behalf of United States Bureau of Prisons (Attorney Russell E Smoot added to party United States Bureau of Prisons(pty:res))(Smoot, Russell)
March 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline for US Attorney to respond to the Petition and Affidavit set for 3/19/2019. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 EMERGENCY REQUEST/MOTION re Home Confinement by Emmanuel Roy. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SG, Case Administrator)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO RESPOND ***ACTION REQUIRED*** re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Emmanuel Roy. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number. (AY, Case Administrator)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Emergency Order to Show Cause by Emmanual Roy re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Emmanuel Roy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(AY, Case Administrator)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 Writ of Habeas Corpus Petition Pursuant to Section 2241 (Filing fee $5.00, Receipt #SPO034171) Filed by Emmanuel Roy.(AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. United States Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Russell E Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emmanuel Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?