Harter v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Harter
Defendant: National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #5 and #6 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Kelly L. Malloy and Peter DeChiara, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendant National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kelly Malloy. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3192246. by National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewan, Laura)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Peter DeChiara. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3192227. by National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewan, Laura)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Ewan on behalf of National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO (Attorney Laura Elizabeth Ewan added to party National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO(pty:dft))(Ewan, Laura)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued to United States Attorney (Attachments: #1 Summons Office of the Attorney General, #2 Summons National Association of Letter Carriers, #3 Summons United States Postmaster General)(AY, Case Administrator)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte Document by Ryan Harter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Finer, Jeffry)
May 14, 2019 Payment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3165676).. (Finer, Jeffry)
May 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants IFP Pending Jury Demand. Filed by Ryan Harter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finer, Jeffry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harter v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Harter
Represented By: Jeffry Keith Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association Letter Carriers AFL-CIO
Represented By: Peter D DeChiara
Represented By: Kelly L Malloy
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Ewan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?