Bank of America NA v. Algaier et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America NA
Defendant: Timothy D Algaier, Jane and/or John Doe and Debra Eddy
Case Number: 2:2019cv00181
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Defendants Motion for Stay ECF No. #1 is DENIED. Plaintiff Bank of Americas Motion to Remand ECF No. #2 is GRANTED. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Spokane County Superior Court for all further proceedings (former Spokane County Superior Court No. 19201839-32). The file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW; NOTICE OF US SUPREME COURT DECISION re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Timothy D Algaier and Debra Eddy. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bank of America NA. (Sutherland, Kelly)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America NA. (Sutherland, Kelly)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Bank of America NA. (Sutherland, Kelly)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand by Bank of America NA. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Sutherland, Kelly)
May 30, 2019 Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to #1 MOTION to Stay and Removal from State Court. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF STATE COURT PROCEEDING TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT* AND MOTION FOR STAY OF THE PROCEEDINGS FOR 60 DAYS Filed by Debra Eddy, Timothy D Algaier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AY, Case Administrator)Filing Fee $400 Receipt No. SPO034804. Modified on 5/28/2019 to add receipt number. (AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America NA v. Algaier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America NA
Represented By: James A Craft
Represented By: Kelly D Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D Algaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?