Clements et al v. Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation et al
Plaintiff: James A Clements and Jason Clements
Defendant: Court of the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation and Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00201
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C D'Avignon on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jason C D'Avignon added to party Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation(pty:dft), Attorney Jason C D'Avignon added to party Court of the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation(pty:dft))(D'Avignon, Jason)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (Johns, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued to Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation (Attachments: #1 Summons Court of the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation) as to All Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator)
June 5, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3183332) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons The Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, #3 Summons The Court of the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation)(Johns, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements et al v. Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court of the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Represented By: Jason C D'Avignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Represented By: Jason C D'Avignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Clements
Represented By: Michael W Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Clements
Represented By: Michael W Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?