Frank v. Cannabis & Glass LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roberta Frank
Defendant: Cannabis & Glass LLC, Springbig Inc, Tate Kapple and NXNW Retail LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00250
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Springbig Inc. (Marisseau, Medora)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Springbig Inc.'s Motions for Leave to Admit Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso and Mark S. Eisen pro hac vice, ECF Nos. #22 , #23 , are GRANTED. Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso and Mark S. Eisen are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants local counsel of record, Medora A. Marisseau, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Mark S. Eisen. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3261537. by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marisseau, Medora)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3261516. by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marisseau, Medora)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Filing Deadline to Respond to Defendant Springbig's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #19 , is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 a.m. by teleconference call before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-204-5984 / Access code: 6790153 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before Magstrate Judge)(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Response to Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Cameron)(Miller, Kirk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Kirk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Cannabis & Glass LLC, Tate Kapple, NXNW Retail LLC.(Devlin, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limit, ECF No. #15 is GRANTED. Defendants are granted leave to file a twenty-three (23) page Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an additional three (3) pages in his reply. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marisseau, Medora)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 at 02:45 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marisseau, Medora)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendant Springbig, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, ECF No. #12 , is GRANTED. The deadline for filing a response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is extended to September 6, 2019. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. #5 and #6 , are DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (PL, Case Administrator)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marisseau, Medora)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Roberta Frank. (Miller, Kirk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Springbig, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Almeida, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. David S. Almeida is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendant's local counsel of record, Medora A. Marisseau, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (TR, Case Administrator)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: David S. Almeida. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3230347. by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Marisseau, Medora)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by Roberta Frank.(Miller, Kirk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Springbig Inc. (Marisseau, Medora)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Springbig Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Marisseau, Medora)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cannabis & Glass LLC, Tate Kapple, NXNW Retail LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Devlin, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cannabis & Glass LLC, NXNW Retail LLC. (Devlin, John)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Cannabis & Glass, LLC, Tate Kapple, NXNW Retail, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Devlin, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of John S. Devlin re #1 Notice of Removal by Cannabis & Glass, LLC, Tate Kapple, NXNW Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Devlin, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3218475 Filed by Tate Kapple, Cannabis & Glass, LLC, NXNW Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Devlin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. Cannabis & Glass LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannabis & Glass LLC
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springbig Inc
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: David S Almeida
Represented By: Mark S Eisen
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Kapple
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXNW Retail LLC
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Frank
Represented By: Brian Cameron
Represented By: Kirk D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?