Eiselein v. Disability Management & Consulting Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kai T Eiselein
Defendant: Disability Management & Consulting Inc, Matt Nystul and Leslie Weaver
Case Number: 2:2019cv00252
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants by Kai T Eiselein. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kai T Eiselein re Disability Management & Consulting Inc, Leslie Weaver, and Matt Nystul.(AY, Case Administrator)
August 22, 2019 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #spo 035374 in the amount of $75.00 from Kai Eiselein. (CLP, Case Administrator)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Civil Cover Sheet to include signature by Kai T Eiselein. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(AY, Case Administrator)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the filing or determination of an action involving a copyright. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $75.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Disability Management & Consulting Inc, Matt Nystul, Leslie Weaver (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Kai T Eiselein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (unsigned), #2 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eiselein v. Disability Management & Consulting Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Management & Consulting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Nystul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai T Eiselein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?