Russell v. GC Services Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Gerald Russell
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2019cv00273
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Farron Danelle Curry on behalf of GC Services Limited Partnership (Attorney Farron Danelle Curry added to party GC Services Limited Partnership(pty:dft))(Curry, Farron)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gerald Russell re GC Services Limited Partnership. (Mitchell, Robert)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Bona Fide Error Defense by Gerald Russell. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Mitchell, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 GC Services Limited Partnership ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by GC Services Limited Partnership.(Krashan, Allison)
August 24, 2019 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against GC Services Limited Partnership. Jury Demand. Filed by Gerald Russell.(Mitchell, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3234650 Filed by GC Services Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krashan, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. GC Services Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Russell
Represented By: Robert Wayne Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership
Represented By: Allison Kathleen Krashan
Represented By: Farron Danelle Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?