Todd v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jeanie Todd
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00279
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa A Wolf on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Leisa A Wolf added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Wolf, Leisa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanie Todd re Andrew M Saul. (Brandt, Cory)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney, #2 Attorney General)(SG, Case Administrator)
August 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Jeanie Todd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Brandt, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Leisa A Wolf
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Todd
Represented By: Cory J Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?