Armstrong v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Armstrong
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00282
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Andsager on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Diana Andsager added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Andsager, Diana)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Armstrong re Andrew M Saul. (Hatfield, Chad)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of essential information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (MO, Courtroom Deputy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued to General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General) as to Andrew M Saul.(AY, Case Administrator)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by 08/26/2019. Case Management Deadline set for 8/26/2019. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by James Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Diana Andsager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Armstrong
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?