O'Rourke v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Rourke
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., a Delaware corporation, Ashley Loyd, an individual, Ashley Loyd and JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Trustee: Kevin, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee for th O'Rourke
Debtor: Alma Briseida Avila
Case Number: 2:2019cv00302
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY ACTION AND SUBMIT PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Action and Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order granting Stipulation to Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration and Staying Action)(Greving, Brett)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #3 , #4 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Anneliese Wermuth and Brett Greving having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, and Defendant Ashley Loyd. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 30, 2019 Payment Received. Receipt #SPO035418 in the amount of $400 from Helen McFarland re Pro Hac Vice Motions for Anneliese Wermuth and Bret Greving. (PL, Case Administrator)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Brett Greving. Filing fee $ 200. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McFarland, Helen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Anneliese Wermuth. Filing fee $ 200. by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McFarland, Helen)
August 29, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 29, 2019 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #SPO035412 in the amount of $400 from Helen McFarland. (PL, Case Administrator)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., a Delaware corporation. (McFarland, Helen)
August 29, 2019 Payment for Civil Case (Filing fee $ 400).. (McFarland, Helen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400 Filed by Ashley Loyd, an individual, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Helen McFarland in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Complaint, #4 Notice of State Court Filed Documents, #5 Notice to Plaintiff re: Removal)(McFarland, Helen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Rourke v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kevin, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee for th O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Helen M McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Loyd, an individual
Represented By: Helen M McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Loyd
Represented By: Helen M McFarland
Represented By: Brett Greving
Represented By: Anneliese Wermuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Helen M McFarland
Represented By: Brett Greving
Represented By: Anneliese Wermuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Alma Briseida Avila
Represented By: Kevin W Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Rourke
Represented By: Kevin Daniel O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?