Blakely v. Kato
Plaintiff: Ralph Howard Blakely
Defendant: Kenneth H Kato
Case Number: 2:2019cv00322
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE AND RETURN by Ralph Howard Blakely re Kenneth H Kato. (AY, Case Administrator)**1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Ralph Blakely, Prisoner ID: 817995)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN by Ralph Howard Blakely re Kenneth H Kato. (AY, Case Administrator)**1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Ralph Blakely, Prisoner ID: 817995)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number. (AY, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Ralph Blakely, Prisoner ID: 817995)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint for Financial Exploitation, Breach of Agreement, Judicial Duty, Negligence, Legal Malpractice, Misrepresentation (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # SPO035560) Filed by Ralph Howard Blakely.(AY, Case Administrator) **27 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ralph Blakely, Prisoner ID: 817995)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakely v. Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth H Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Howard Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?