Lee v. The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago
Plaintiff: Yuki Lee
Defendant: Moody Bible Institute of Chicago
Case Number: 2:2019cv00326
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 01:15 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Scheduling Conference held on 11/4/2019. (Reported/Recorded by: None) (ES, Courtroom Deputy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Joint by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. (Schroeder, William)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Moody Bible Institute of Chicago's Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #9 , #11 , and #13 , are GRANTED. Michael G. McQuillen, Nicholas J. Ajello, and Christopher J. Raistrick are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendants local counsel of record, William C. Schroeder, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION by Christopher J. Raistrick in Support re #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Christopher J. Raistrick. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3279957. filed by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. (Schroeder, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Christopher J. Raistrick. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3279957. by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Schroeder, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION by Nicholas J. Ajello in Support re #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Nicholas J. Ajello. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3279950. filed by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. (Schroeder, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Nicholas J. Ajello. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3279950. by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Schroeder, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Michael G. McQuillen in Support re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael G. McQuillen. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3279935. filed by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. (Schroeder, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael G. McQuillen. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3279935. by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Schroeder, William)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago.(Schroeder, William)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - By Court: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/4/2019 at 11:00 a.m. via teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-636-3807 / Access code: 8839796 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before Magstrate Judge)(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. (Schroeder, William)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Moody Bible Institute of Chicago.(Schroeder, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Marsh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Anthony Marsh added to party Yuki Lee(pty:pla))(Marsh, Anthony)
September 24, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago. (Schroeder, William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe filed by The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago: Re #1 Notice of Removal. Description: Add attachment. (Schroeder, William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3270655 Filed by The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago.(Schroeder, William) Modified on 9/24/2019: Praecipe filed at ECF #2 . (AN, Courtroom Deputy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuki Lee
Represented By: Charles Julius Herrmann
Represented By: Anthony Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moody Bible Institute of Chicago
Represented By: William C Schroeder
Represented By: Nicholas Ajello
Represented By: Christopher J Raistrick
Represented By: Michael G McQuillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?