White v. Spokane Washington Hospital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bradley White
Defendant: Deaconess Hospital, Brian Rowe and Spokane Washington Hospital Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00327
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Bradley White. (Fossum, Michelle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE : A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 12/3/2019 at 10:30 AM by teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-204-5984 / Access code: 6790153 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before Magstrate Judge)(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Yakely, Heather)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - ECF No. #6 , and associated AGREED MOTION TO EXPEDITE AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME, ECF No. #7 . Under FRCP 15(a)(3), the deadline for Defendant to file an answer to the Amended Complaint is November 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order on the matter. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Bradley White. Jury Demand. Filed by Bradley White.(Fossum, Michelle)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Agreed Motion for Extension by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Yakely, Heather)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Yakely, Heather)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants Deaconess Hospital, Brian Rowe. Attorney Steven H. Winterbauer is withdrawing. Heather C Yakely is substituted as counsel for Defendants. (Attorney Heather C Yakely added to party Deaconess Hospital(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C Yakely added to party Brian Rowe(pty:dft))(Yakely, Heather)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) (Federal Question) by Bradley White. (Fossum, Michelle)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Deaconess Hospital, Brian Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gillard-Byers, Nicholas)
September 25, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deaconess Hospital. (Gillard-Byers, Nicholas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3271453 Filed by Deaconess Hospital, Brian Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Summonses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillard-Byers, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Spokane Washington Hospital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deaconess Hospital
Represented By: Nicholas Gillard-Byers
Represented By: Steven Hill Winterbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Rowe
Represented By: Nicholas Gillard-Byers
Represented By: Steven Hill Winterbauer
Represented By: Heather C Yakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane Washington Hospital Company LLC
Represented By: Steven Hill Winterbauer
Represented By: Nicholas Gillard-Byers
Represented By: Heather C Yakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley White
Represented By: Kristina R Montanez
Represented By: Michelle Kay Fossum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?