United States of America v. Real Property Known as 908 North Bowdish Road, Spokane, Washington
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Known as 908 North Bowdish Road, Spokane, Washington
Claimant: Jeffrey Jon Franklin
Case Number: 2:2019cv00357
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2254
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is set for 7/9/2020 at 9:00 AM and Jury Trial is set for 7/20/2020 at 8:30 AM both are set in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice: Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2019. (Reported by: Rachael Hall) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Jeffrey Jon Franklin.(Finer, Jeffry)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by United States of America. (Donovan, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE by Posting filed by United States of America. Posting date 11/20/19. (Donovan, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #2 Notice of Lis Pendens, #1 Complaint sent via regular and certified U.S. mail to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint (Chase Bank))(Donovan, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM by Jeffrey Jon Franklin. (Finer, Jeffry)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by United States of America re Jeffrey Jon Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture)(Donovan, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Donovan, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Property Known as 908 North Bowdish Road, Spokane, Washington Fee Waived Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Known as 908 North Bowdish Road, Spokane, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Known as 908 North Bowdish Road, Spokane, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jeffrey Jon Franklin
Represented By: Jeffry Keith Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?