Fischer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Justin Fischer
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00367
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/16/2021 09:30 AM. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Scheduling Conference held on 11/21/2019. (Reported/Recorded by: Ronelle F. Corbey) (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 Praecipe filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated: Re #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #19 Status Report. Description: Incorrect Method of Service. (Tompkins, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #17 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James F. Rogers, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Defendants CR Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tompkins, Christopher). See Praecipe filed at ECF No. #21 for manner of service on Certificate of Service. Modified on 11/15/2019 (PL, Case Administrator).
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: James F. Rogers. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3302401. by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tompkins, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated of Withdrawal by Richard B. North (Tompkins, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha A Khachatourians on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Khachatourians, Natasha)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Tompkins on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Christopher W Tompkins added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher W Tompkins added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Tompkins, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 28, 2019 Remark: Notice Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference mailed to all counsel on 10/28/2019. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 MASTER AND SHORT-FORM PLEADINGS Ct Rec 364 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 303-2, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 366, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 1153-1, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 1153-2) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS Ct Rec 10348 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 10403, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 10438, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 10486, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 10497, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 10524, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 10922, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 11064, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 11073, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 11080, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 11313, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 12357, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 12508, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 12590, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 12595, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 12598, #16 15md2641 Ct Rec 17386, #17 15md2641 Ct Rec 17513, #18 15md2641 Ct Rec 17582) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDERS Ct Rec 9861 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 9881, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 10075, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 10235, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 10258, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 10382, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 10489, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 10819, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 10920, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 10947, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 11041, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 11082, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 11256, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 12507, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 12533, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 17401) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DAUBERT ORDERS Ct Rec 9428 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 9432, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 9433, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 9434, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 9770, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 9771, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 9772, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 9773, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 9991, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 10051, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 10052, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 10072, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 10230, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 10231, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 16992, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 17285) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS Ct Rec 699 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 2813, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 8315) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DISCOVERY ORDERS Ct Rec 3272 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 3312, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 3313, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 3314, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 3398, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 4339, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 4865) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS Ct Rec 248 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 4016, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 5285, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 15098, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 249, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 314, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 363, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 1108, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 1485, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 365, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 927, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 372, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 401, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 519, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 1259, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 1319, #16 15md2641 Ct Rec 1662, #17 15md2641 Ct Rec 1663, #18 15md2641 Ct Rec 2238, #19 15md2641 Ct Rec 2239, #20 15md2641 Ct Rec 3214, #21 15md2641 Ct Rec 3215, #22 15md2641 Ct Rec 4141, #23 15md2641 Ct Rec 3372, #24 15md2641 Ct Rec 4015, #25 15md2641 Ct Rec 3685, #26 15md2641 Ct Rec 4311, #27 15md2641 Ct Rec 4335, #28 15md2641 Ct Rec 4866, #29 15md2641 Ct Rec 5007, #30 15md2641 Ct Rec 5770, #31 15md2641 Ct Rec 5881, #32 15md2641 Ct Rec 5883, #33 15md2641 Ct Rec 6227, #34 15md2641 Ct Rec 6799, #35 15md2641 Ct Rec 8113, #36 15md2641 Ct Rec 8871, #37 15md2641 Ct Rec 9415, #38 15md2641 Ct Rec 9775, #39 15md2641 Ct Rec 10323, #40 15md2641 Ct Rec 11011, #41 15md2641 Ct Rec 11320, #42 15md2641 Ct Rec 11659, #43 15md2641 Ct Rec 11871, #44 15md2641 Ct Rec 12061, #45 15md2641 Ct Rec 12830, #46 15md2641 Ct Rec 12853, #47 15md2641 Ct Rec 12971, #48 15md2641 Ct Rec 13329, #49 15md2641 Ct Rec 15176, #50 15md2641 Ct Rec 16343, #51 15md2641 Ct Rec 17494) (JW, ECF Admin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04121. Docket sheet received.
October 25, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04121-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16983046 filed by Justin Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Fischer
Represented By: Adam W Krause
Represented By: Robert L Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?