Gordon v. Healthy Halo Insurance Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Issac Gordon
Defendant: Healthy Halo Insurance Services, Inc., CallFire, Inc, CallFire Inc and Healthy Halo Insurance Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00387
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and Plaintiff Isaac Gordon and Defendant CallFire, Inc.s stipulation #5 , all claims by Plaintiff Isaac Gordon against Defendant CallFire, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of fees or costs to either party. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by CallFire Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Turner, Duncan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Healthy Halo Insurance Services Inc. (Wilson, Erin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Wilson on behalf of Healthy Halo Insurance Services Inc (Attorney Erin M Wilson added to party Healthy Halo Insurance Services Inc(pty:dft))(Wilson, Erin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CallFire Inc. (Turner, Duncan)
November 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3307999 Filed by CallFire, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Summons))(Turner, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Healthy Halo Insurance Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Gordon
Represented By: Brian Cameron
Represented By: Shayne Sutherland
Represented By: Kirk D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthy Halo Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallFire, Inc
Represented By: Duncan C Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallFire Inc
Represented By: Duncan C Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthy Halo Insurance Services Inc
Represented By: Erin M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?