Boyd v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Christopher Boyd and Nicholas Michael Brinkley
Defendant: State of Washington, Superior Court, Leslie, Grant County, Villareal and Irwin
Case Number: 2:2019cv00395
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 REVISED CASE OPENING Letter from Clerk US District Court to Nicholas Boyd dated 11/18/2019 (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Nicholas Christopher Boyd.(CLP, Case Administrator) **9 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-05897. Docket sheet received.
November 1, 2019 Case will be sent to District of Eastern District of Washington by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. If case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/18/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against the State of Washington; this case is to be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179)(DN) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/18/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Noted for 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE re 3 Prison Trust Account Statement. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/18/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 10/24/2019 to correct. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Boyd, Prisoner ID: 331179) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Christopher Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villareal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?