Kessack v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Erik Kessack
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections, Justine Romano and Department of Corrections Employees John/Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2019cv00423
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 and a Jury Trial is set for 2/8/2021 at 8:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice: Scheduling Conference held on 2/6/2020. (Reported by: Crystal Hicks) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Plan by Department of Corrections Employees John/Jane Does, Justine Romano, Washington State Department of Corrections. (Taylor, Derek)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Attorney Derek T Taylor added to party Department of Corrections Employees John/Jane Does(pty:dft))(Taylor, Derek)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by All Defendants to Plaintiff of Removal (Taylor, Derek)
December 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3337312 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Of Appearance, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Assignment, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit Decl. of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit Decl. of Service, #6 Exhibit F Superior Court Docket, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessack v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Derek T Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Romano
Represented By: Derek T Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections Employees John/Jane Does
Represented By: Derek T Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Kessack
Represented By: Breean Lawrence Beggs
Represented By: Andrew Sean Biviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?