United States of America v. $5,000.00 US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $5,000.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2020cv00040
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #6 Warrant of Arrest In Rem - Returned, #1 Complaint served via certified and regular first class US Mail filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Dawnson, John), #2 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Kung Fu Vapes), #3 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Scott, Bertha), #4 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Scott, FNU), #5 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Scott, Geronimo), #6 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Scott, Harry), #7 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Scott, Samuel), #8 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Wade, Ken), #9 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Wade, Keri))(Donovan, Brian)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest In Rem - Returned EXECUTED by United States of America re $5,000.00 US Currency. (Donovan, Brian)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Publication date 1/28/20 - 2/26/20. (Attachments: #1 Declaration re Internet Publication Notice and Certification, #2 Internet Publication Notice and Certification)(Donovan, Brian)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (LR, Case Administrator)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Donovan, Brian)
January 22, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $5,000.00 U.S. Currency Fee Waived Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $5,000.00 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,000.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?