Mahan v. Core Values Roadside Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mahan
Defendant: Core Values Roadside Service, LLC and Mark Hyndman
Case Number: 2:2020cv00106
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE; granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Stephen E. Imm for Elizabeth Mahan. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AN, Courtroom Deputy).
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Matthew S. Okiishi for Elizabeth Mahan. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Matt Okiishi. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3444362. by Elizabeth Mahan. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Crotty, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Stephen Imm. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3444353. by Elizabeth Mahan. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Crotty, Matthew)
April 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Matthew Z Crotty on behalf of Elizabeth Mahan (Attorney Matthew Z Crotty added to party Elizabeth Mahan(pty:pla))(Crotty, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Jeremy Scott Hyndman on behalf of Defendant Core Values Roadside Service, LLC (Hyndman, Jeremy)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 08:10 AM before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge form)(DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Main Document 21 replaced on 3/23/2020) (DB, Courtroom Deputy). (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court's CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail)
March 18, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00480. Docket sheet received.
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Based on the above, Defendants motion (Doc. 11) is GRANTED, and the clerk is ORDERED to transfer this case, along with therelated case Linz, et al. v. Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, etal., 1:19-cv-529, to the Eastern District of Washington SpokaneDivision pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 03/17/2020. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Case transferred to Eastern District of Washington Spokane Division.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on said motions doc #11 #15 be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, MARCH 11, 2020 AT 1:00 p.m. via telephone conference. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the call five minutes before the call is scheduled to begin. To connect to the call, dial 877-336-1280. Then, when prompted to enter the participant access code, enter 4610163. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 2/13/2020. (cb) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman. (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Elizabeth Mahan. (Imm, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Mahan. (Imm, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Scott Hyndman. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/13/2019. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman re #11 MOTION to Change Venue or, Alternatively, to Dismiss Action in Its Entirety (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exh. A [Proposed] Order on Motion to Transfer or Dismiss) (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7194283) of Jeremy Scott Hyndman by Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exh. B [Proposed] Order) (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss Action in Its Entirety by Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss and Attached Unreported Lexis Cases, #2 Declaration of Mark Hyndman in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss and Attached Exhibit 1) (Lambert, Marnie). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 11/12/2019 (eh). Modified docket text on 11/12/2019 (eh). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Additional Extension of Time for Defendants to Move or Plead in Response to Complaint by Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman. (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Move or Plead in Response to Complaint by Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman. (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marnie C Lambert for Defendants Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman (Lambert, Marnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mark Hyndman. Mark Hyndman served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Imm, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Core Values Roadside Service, LLC. Core Values Roadside Service, LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Imm, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Okiishi, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Okiishi, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
June 26, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Core Values Roadside Service, LLC, Mark Hyndman ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6982613), filed by Elizabeth Mahan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Imm, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 3/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahan v. Core Values Roadside Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mahan
Represented By: Matthew S. Okiishi
Represented By: Stephen E Imm
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Values Roadside Service, LLC
Represented By: Marnie C Lambert
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Hyndman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hyndman
Represented By: Marnie C Lambert
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Hyndman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?