K&N Electric Motors Inc v. Lofthouse et al
Plaintiff: K&N Electric Motors Inc
Defendant: Jane Doe Lofthouse, Soldiers-Supply and Ray Lofthouse
Case Number: 2:2020cv00141
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Andrew Hatch on behalf of Jane Doe Lofthouse, Ray Lofthouse, Soldiers-Supply (Attorney Caleb Andrew Hatch added to party Jane Doe Lofthouse(pty:dft), Attorney Caleb Andrew Hatch added to party Ray Lofthouse(pty:dft), Attorney Caleb Andrew Hatch added to party Soldiers-Supply(pty:dft))(Hatch, Caleb)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce James Wilcox on behalf of Jane Doe Lofthouse, Ray Lofthouse, Soldiers-Supply (Attorney Bryce James Wilcox added to party Jane Doe Lofthouse(pty:dft), Attorney Bryce James Wilcox added to party Ray Lofthouse(pty:dft), Attorney Bryce James Wilcox added to party Soldiers-Supply(pty:dft))(Wilcox, Bryce)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by Frank James of Non-Service of Soldiers-Supply by K&N Electric Motors Inc. (Campbell, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by Frank James of Non-Service on Jane Doe Lofthouse by K&N Electric Motors Inc. (Campbell, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by Frank James of Non-Service by K&N Electric Motors Inc. (Campbell, Richard)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued to Ray Lofthouse (Attachments: #1 Summons Jane Doe Lofthouse, #2 Summons Soldiers Supply) as to all Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator)
April 6, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by K&N Electric Motors, Inc.. (Campbell, Richard)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3436339) Filed by K&N Electric Motors, Inc..(Campbell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&N Electric Motors Inc v. Lofthouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Lofthouse
Represented By: Caleb Andrew Hatch
Represented By: Bryce James Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soldiers-Supply
Represented By: Caleb Andrew Hatch
Represented By: Bryce James Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Lofthouse
Represented By: Caleb Andrew Hatch
Represented By: Bryce James Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&N Electric Motors Inc
Represented By: Tyler S Waite
Represented By: Richard Duncan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?