Doe v. Elson S Floyd College of Medicine at Washington State University
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Elson S Floyd College of Medicine at Washington State University
Case Number: 2:2020cv00145
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge form)(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Ulrich, Nicholas)
April 8, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of NIcholas Ulrich re #2 Notice of Removal,, by All Defendants. (Ulrich, Nicholas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3437313 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit BB-Notice of Status Conf, #4 Exhibit C-NOA-Freedman, #5 Exhibit D-Summons, #6 Exhibit E-NOA-Ulrich, #7 Exhibit F-Motion For Default, #8 Exhibit G-Aff in Support, #9 Exhibit H-Note For Hearing, #10 Exhibit I-Answer, #11 Exhibit J-Cert of Service, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ulrich, Nicholas) Modified on 4/8/2020 to add receipt number (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 4/8/2020 to correct fee info(VR, Courtroom Deputy).
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Civil Cover Sheet Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3437313 Filed by L ELSON S. FLOYD COLLEGE OF MEDICINE AT WASHINGTON STATE UNIVERSITY.(Ulrich, Nicholas) Modified on 4/8/2020 to correct name of document filed. (AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Elson S Floyd College of Medicine at Washington State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Sarah L Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elson S Floyd College of Medicine at Washington State University
Represented By: Nicholas R Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?