Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc v. Gillespie III
Plaintiff: Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc
Defendant: Joseph G Gillespie, III
Case Number: 2:2020cv00151
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ORDER OF DEFAULT as to Joseph G Gillespie, III (JW, ECF Admin)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION by Jordan Clark in Support re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Joseph G. Gillespie III filed by Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pg 3-6, #2 Exhibit B, 7-9)(McCullough, Hugh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Joseph G. Gillespie III by Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCullough, Hugh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc re Joseph G Gillespie, III. (McCullough, Hugh)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph G Gillespie, III. (AY, Case Administrator)
April 15, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc. (McCullough, Hugh)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Gillespie, III Filed by Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCullough, Hugh) Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3442256. Modified on 4/15/2020 to add receipt number. (AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc v. Gillespie III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G Gillespie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Lion Hotels Franchising Inc
Represented By: Jordan Clark
Represented By: Hugh McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?