Kuykendall v. Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc
Plaintiff: Douglas Kuykendall
Defendant: Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00154
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc.(Diamond, Kenneth)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties' Stipulation and Agreed Order to Extend Deadline to File Answer, ECF No. #5 , is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ECF No. 6, by no later than June 10, 2020. The parties are reminded that when a motion seeks time-sensitive relief, such as to extend a deadline occurring before a motion would typically be set for hearing, counsel must file a motion to expedite. See LCivR 7(i)(2)(C). Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Kuykendall re Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc. (Crotty, Matthew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc. Jury Demand. Filed by Douglas Kuykendall.(Crotty, Matthew)
May 19, 2020 Reset Motion Hearing as to #5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. pursuant to date listed on motion (motion was mistakenly set for 5/18/2020 when docketed) (CV, Case Administrator)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Diamond, Kenneth)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc. (Diamond, Kenneth)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Diamond on behalf of Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc (Attorney Kenneth J Diamond added to party Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc(pty:dft))(Diamond, Kenneth)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
April 15, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3442471) Jury Demand. Filed by Douglas Kuykendall. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crotty, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuykendall v. Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Kuykendall
Represented By: Michael Bradley Love
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Schwab Tire Centers of Washington Inc
Represented By: Kenneth J Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?