Hay et al v. Asotin County Washington et al
Plaintiff: Lucas Brooklyn Anderson, Dawna Larson and Kathy Hay
Defendant: Asotin County Washington, John Wiesman, Robert Lutz, Asotin County Health District, James Jeffords and Asotin County Board of Health
Case Number: 2:2020cv00155
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE by Lucas Brooklyn Anderson, Dawna Larson, Kathy Hay re John Wiesman. (Smith, Erica)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 ASOTIN COUNTY AND JAMES JEFFORDS IN HIS CAPACITY AS CHAIRMAN OF THE ASOTIN COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS ANSWER to Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY by Asotin County Washington, James Jeffords.(Moberg, Jerry)
May 15, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint Submitted by Asotin County Board of Health, Asotin County Health District, James Jeffords, Robert Lutz.(Fossum, Michelle)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for July 10, 2020, at 10:00 AM before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by John Wiesman.(Lopez, Lilia)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilia Lopez on behalf of John Wiesman (Attorney Lilia Lopez added to party John Wiesman(pty:dft))(Lopez, Lilia)
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Robert Lutz. (Smith, Erica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Asotin County Health District. (Smith, Erica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Asotin County Board of Health. (Smith, Erica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re James Jeffords. (Smith, Erica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Asotin County Washington. (Smith, Erica)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Kay Fossum on behalf of James Jeffords (Attorney Michelle Kay Fossum added to party James Jeffords(pty:dft))(Fossum, Michelle)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina R Montanez on behalf of Asotin County Board of Health, Asotin County Health District, Asotin County Washington, James Jeffords, Robert Lutz (Attorney Kristina R Montanez added to party Asotin County Board of Health(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina R Montanez added to party Asotin County Health District(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina R Montanez added to party Asotin County Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina R Montanez added to party James Jeffords(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina R Montanez added to party Robert Lutz(pty:dft))(Montanez, Kristina)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Kay Fossum on behalf of Asotin County Board of Health, Asotin County Health District, Robert Lutz (Attorney Michelle Kay Fossum added to party Asotin County Board of Health(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Kay Fossum added to party Asotin County Health District(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Kay Fossum added to party Robert Lutz(pty:dft))(Fossum, Michelle)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry John Moberg on behalf of Asotin County Washington, James Jeffords (Attorney Jerry John Moberg added to party Asotin County Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry John Moberg added to party James Jeffords(pty:dft))(Moberg, Jerry)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #2 and #3 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Caroline Grace Brothers and Erica Smith, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Plaintiffs. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Constitutional Challenge Certification. A copy of this certification has been mailed to the Washington Attorney General. NO JUDGMENT HOLDING STATUTE UNCONSTITUTIONAL MAY ENTER UNTIL AFTER ATTORNEY GENERAL INTERVENES OR 60 DAY DEADLINE FOR INTERVENTION LAPSES. (CLP, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Asotin County Health District, #2 Summons Asotin County Washington, #3 Summons James Jeffords, #4 Summons John Wiesman, #5 Summons Robert Lutz)(CLP, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge Re #1 Complaint, by Lucas Brooklyn Anderson, Kathy Hay, Dawna Larson. Clerk shall prepare and send Certification of Constitutional Challenge to Attorney General. Follow Up on 6/15/2020. (Bindas, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Caroline Grace Brothers. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3442767. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bindas, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Erica Smith. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3442750. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bindas, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3442624) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Board of Health Meeting Minutes, #2 Exhibit B - Donated Food Distributing Organization Questionnaire, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Bindas, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hay et al v. Asotin County Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Brooklyn Anderson
Represented By: Caroline Grace Brothers
Represented By: Michael E Bindas
Represented By: Erica Smith
Represented By: Erica J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawna Larson
Represented By: Caroline Grace Brothers
Represented By: Michael E Bindas
Represented By: Erica Smith
Represented By: Erica J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Hay
Represented By: Caroline Grace Brothers
Represented By: Michael E Bindas
Represented By: Erica Smith
Represented By: Erica J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asotin County Washington
Represented By: Jerry John Moberg
Represented By: Kristina R Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiesman
Represented By: Lilia Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lutz
Represented By: Michelle Kay Fossum
Represented By: Kristina R Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asotin County Health District
Represented By: Michelle Kay Fossum
Represented By: Kristina R Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jeffords
Represented By: Jerry John Moberg
Represented By: Michelle Kay Fossum
Represented By: Kristina R Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asotin County Board of Health
Represented By: Michelle Kay Fossum
Represented By: Kristina R Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?