Morgan v. Bank of America NA
Plaintiff: Daniel Morgan
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00157
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank of America NA. (Coughlin, Laura)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Teri A. Bracken Re Defs MTD and Oral Argument re #5 Response to Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Kirk)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Miller, Kirk)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: DEADLINES. The Court has received Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 3. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than May 26, 2020. Defendant's reply shall be filed no later than June 10, 2020. The Motion to Dismiss hearing remains set on June 30, 2020, without oral argument. The Court will set a telephonic scheduling conference, if necessary, after the Motion to Dismiss has been decided. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America NA. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Coughlin, Laura)
April 16, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A.. (Coughlin, Laura)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3443095 Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Coughlin, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Laura Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Morgan
Represented By: Brian Cameron
Represented By: Kirk D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?