Security National Insurance Company v. Construction Associates of Spokane Inc
Plaintiff: Security National Insurance Company
Defendant: Construction Associates of Spokane Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00167
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Security National Insurance Company re Construction Associates of Spokane Inc. (Laveson, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant by Bradley Edward Smith on behalf of Construction Associates of Spokane Inc (Attorney Bradley Edward Smith added to party Construction Associates of Spokane Inc(pty:dft))(Smith, Bradley)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Construction Associates of Spokane Inc. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
April 30, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Security National Insurance Company. (Laveson, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Security National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Laveson, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Construction Associates of Spokane, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3450435) Filed by Security National Insurance Company.(Laveson, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security National Insurance Company v. Construction Associates of Spokane Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Associates of Spokane Inc
Represented By: Bradley Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey David Laveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?